EP0856762 - Optical polarisation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON multimedia 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarayeddine, Khaled THOMSON Multimedia, 46 quai Alphonso Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson multimedia S.A., 46 quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402843.3 | 26.11.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | FR19970000919 | 29.01.1997 Original published format: FR 9700919 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856762 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856762 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28, G02F1/1335 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optische Polarisationsvorrichtung | [1998/32] | English: | Optical polarisation device | [1998/32] | French: | Dispositif optique de polarisation | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 26.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2735875 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 37 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 3 * * figures 3,4,8,9 *; | [A]JPS6234104 ; | [A]EP0606939 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 11, line 50 - column 12, line 53 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0573905 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 11 * * column 9, line 41 - column 10, line 18 * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870714), vol. 011, no. 216, Database accession no. (P - 595), & JP62034104 A 19870214 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |