EP0852134 - Use of a composition containing a ceramide and a sulphonic UV filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubief, Claude 9, rue Edmond Rostang 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | 02 /
Cauwet-Martin, Danièle 53, rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/22] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga - Josse & Petit Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Andral, Christophe André Louis L'OREAL Centre de Recherche Charles Zviak Département Propriété Industrielle 90, rue du Général Roguet 92583 Clichy Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97402952.2 | 05.12.1997 | [1998/28] | Priority number, date | FR19960015762 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615762 | [1998/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852134 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0852134 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/06, A61K7/42 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
A61K8/68 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4946 (KR);
A61K8/898 (KR);
A61Q17/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/28] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Zusammensetzungen, die ein Ceramid und einen UV-Filter mit Sulfonsäuregruppen enthalten | [2001/48] | English: | Use of a composition containing a ceramide and a sulphonic UV filter | [1998/28] | French: | Utilisation d'une composition comprenant un céramide et un filtre UV sulfonique | [1998/28] |
Former [1998/28] | Verwendung von eine Zusammensetzung die ein Ceramid und einen UV-Filter mit einem Sulfonsäurerest enthält | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.09.2002
18.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Postfach 64280 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.09.2002
18.09.2002
ADMISSIBLE KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Postfach 64280 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2002/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.09.2002
Goldwell GmbH Postfach 64280 Darmstadt / DE | 10.10.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.05.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 04.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.01.2006 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2006/29] | 31.01.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.03.2006 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 05.12.2001 | LU | 05.12.2001 | MC | 05.12.2001 | FI | 05.12.2005 | IE | 05.12.2005 | SE | 06.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | DK | 02.01.2006 | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/29] | LU | 05.12.2001 | |
MC | 05.12.2001 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
SE | 06.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 02.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
SE | 06.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 02.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
SE | 06.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/49] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
IE | 05.12.2005 | ||
SE | 06.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/37] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
SE | 06.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
FI | 05.12.2005 | ||
Former [2004/39] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | MC | 05.12.2001 | |
LU | 05.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/43] | MC | 05.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9500111 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column W *; | [A]FR2718960 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0729744 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [A] - STN, Serveur de Bases de Données,, XP002043602 [A] 1-15 * Karlsruhe, DE, Fichier Chemical Abstracts, vol 122, AN=63969 * résumé * |