EP0850878 - Process and installation for the production of porous ammonium nitrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KALTENBACH - THURING S.A. 9, rue de l'Industrie, Z.I. No. 2 60000 Beauvais / FR | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogel, Edmond 9 rue de la Feuillaume 92420 Vaucresson / FR | 02 /
Monsterleet, Jacques 12, rue Louis Yvert 78160 Marly le Roi / FR | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97403033.0 | 12.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | FR19960016297 | 31.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9616297 | [1998/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850878 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850878 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C01C1/18, C06B31/28, B01J2/12 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
C06B31/28 (EP,US);
B01J2/12 (EP,US);
B01J2/16 (EP,US);
C01C1/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung von porösem Ammoniumnitrat | [1998/27] | English: | Process and installation for the production of porous ammonium nitrate | [1998/27] | French: | Procédé et installation pour la fabrication de nitrate d'ammoniaque poreux | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 02.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, LI, LU, MC | 12.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.1999 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2416615 (DATIN RICHARD C) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB894773 (CHEMICAL & IND CORP) [A] 1,6 * claims 1-10 * * page 2, line 16 - line 21 * * page 5, line 85 - line 102 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB990487 (ICI LTD) [A] 1-3,5,6 * claims 1,7,10,21,23,24 * * example 2 *; | ES456079 [ ] (SAEZ DIAZ JESUS M [ES], et al); | [XA]FR2451351 (AZOTE SA CIE NEERLANDAISE [BE]) [X] 1,2,6 * claims 1-3,5,7,8 * * page 1, line 1 - line 3 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 31 * * page 6, line 27 - line 33 * * page 13, line 32 - line 39 * * page 14, line 22 - page 15, line 25 * [A] 3-5; | [XA]EP0068574 (UNIE VAN KUNSTMESTFAB BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [A] 3-5; | [DA]EP0216653 (KALTENBACH THURING SA [FR]) [DA] 1,6 * claims 1-15 * * page 5, line 14 - line 23 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0569163 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * page 4, line 43 - page 5, line 10 * * claims 1,3-5 *; | [A] - SAEZ SAIZ & AL., "Drying of porous ammonium nitrate explosives in "prilling" plants using a fluidized bed", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19790108), vol. 90, no. 2, Database accession no. 8527, XP002040374 [A] 1,3-5 * abstract * |