EP0818247 - Container cover for receiving a dosing pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABAZ, Michel 52 E, route de Grenoble 05100 Briançon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states Babaz, Michel 52 E, route de Grenoble 05100 Briançon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Gasquet, Denis Cabinet Gasquet Route de la Bouvarde Park Nord Les Pléiades 24 D 74370 Epagny Metz-Tessy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Gasquet, Denis CABINET GASQUET, Les Pléiades, Park-Nord Annecy 74370 Metz Tessy / FR | Application number, filing date | 97410071.1 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | FR19960009057 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9609057 | FR19960010981 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9610981 | [1998/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818247 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B65D47/06 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
B65D47/06 (EP);
B05B11/1047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, LI [1998/39] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälterdeckel zur Aufnahme einer Dosierpumpe | [1998/03] | English: | Container cover for receiving a dosing pump | [1998/03] | French: | Couvercle de récipient destiné à recevoir une pompe doseuse | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 15.07.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.09.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.09.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2000 | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB592981 (W A SHEAFFER PEN COMPANY OF CA) [A] 1,2,5,10* the whole document *; | [XA]US3587940 (ELLIS ROY T) [X] 1-3,5 * column A; figure 1 * [A] 6,10; | [A]US4865233 (KAIN KARON L [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * column W *; | [X]GB2240330 (CHIEN SMILEY) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 19; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5392949 (MCKENNA PAUL A [US]) [A] 6-9 * column W * |