EP0808778 - Method of packaging articles made of a hard material but susceptible to scuffing damage, especially terracotta tiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERYS TOITURE Parc d'Activités de Limonest, 1 rue des Vergers, Silic 3 69760 Limonest / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states IMERYS TOITURE Parc d'Activités de Limonest, 1 rue des Verges, Silic 3 69760 Limonest / FR | ||
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states HUGUENOT-FENAL 11 Avenue de la Marne F-51340 Pargny sur Saulx / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dewulf, Jacques Route de Saint Paul, Le Mont St Adrien 60650 Lachapelle aux Pots / FR | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, 12, rue Boileau, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97420075.0 | 20.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | FR19960006523 | 20.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9606523 | [1997/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808778 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808778 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/46, B65D57/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B65D85/46 (EP);
B65D57/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verpacken von Gegenständen aus hartem Material, empfindlich gegen Reibungsschäden, insbesondere von Terrakotta-Dachziegeln | [1997/48] | English: | Method of packaging articles made of a hard material but susceptible to scuffing damage, especially terracotta tiles | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement d'objets en matériau dur mais susceptible d'être détérioré par frottement, notamment de tuiles en terre cuite | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.02.2003 | LU | 20.05.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/41] | NL | 19.02.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2220959 (REDLAND ROOF TILES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-4; claims 1-6 *; | [A]FR2221003 (AGEPAC [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]FR2343707 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]FR2116643 (BOUSSOIS SOUCHON NEUVESEL SA) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2; claims 1-10 * |