EP0810311 - Loom for the realisation of ornamental fringes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sahuc, Michel Zone artisanale les Chauds 42660 Jonzieux / FR | [1997/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sahuc, Antoine Quartier de l'Hôpital 43600 Sainte Sigolene / FR | [1997/49] | Representative(s) | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | [1997/49] | Application number, filing date | 97420079.2 | 27.05.1997 | [1997/49] | Priority number, date | FR19960006962 | 31.05.1996 Original published format: FR 9606962 | [1997/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0810311 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0810311 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D41/00, D03D5/00, D04D5/00 | [1997/49] | CPC: |
D04D5/00 (EP,US);
D03D41/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/49] | Title | German: | Webmaschine zur Herstellung von Zierfransen | [1997/49] | English: | Loom for the realisation of ornamental fringes | [1997/49] | French: | Métier pour la réalisation de franges à tête gansée | [1997/49] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 04.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 02.11.2000 | FR | 02.11.2000 | IT | 02.11.2000 | DE | 03.02.2001 | BE | 31.05.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | ES | 02.11.2000 | |
FR | 02.11.2000 | ||
DE | 03.02.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | ES | 02.11.2000 | |
DE | 03.02.2001 | ||
FR | 30.03.2001 | ||
BE | 31.05.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | ES | 02.11.2000 | |
DE | 03.02.2001 | ||
FR | 30.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | DE | 03.02.2001 | |
FR | 30.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/02] | FR | 30.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1530600 (ADOLPH JENNY, et al); | [A]US3301204 (CHAMBERS BYNOM L); | [A]US3152620 (LIBBY CARL F); | [A]US1746790 (NEWMAN PHILIP N) |