EP0823555 - Centrifugal ventilation device of enhanced performance having at least two suction inlets and related ventilation method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fläkt Solyvent-Ventec 143 rue de la République 69330 Meyzieu / FR | [2003/33] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states ABB Solyvent Ventec 143, rue de la République, BP 67 69882 Meyzieu / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Godichon, Alain Francois Emile 8, rue Jean Effel 71100 Saint Remy / FR | [2002/36] |
Former [1998/07] | 01 /
Godichon, Alain Francois Emeli 8, rue Jean Effel 71100 Saint Remy / FR | Representative(s) | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Martin, Didier, et al Cabinet Didier Martin 50, Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [1998/47] | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry Cabinet Didier Martin 47, rue Benoit Bennier 69260 Charbonnières-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [1998/07] | Martin, Didier Roland Valéry Cabinet Didier Martin 48, Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 97420141.0 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | FR19960010135 | 07.08.1996 Original published format: FR 9610135 | [1998/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0823555 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823555 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02, F04D29/42, F04D17/16 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
F04D29/424 (EP,US);
F04D17/162 (EP,US);
F04D27/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/43] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 02.05.1998 | LT | 02.05.1998 | LV | 02.05.1998 | RO | 02.05.1998 | SI | 02.05.1998 | Title | German: | Kreiselventilationsgerät mit verbesserter Leistung mit wenigstens zwei Saugöffnungen und Ventilationsverfahren | [1998/07] | English: | Centrifugal ventilation device of enhanced performance having at least two suction inlets and related ventilation method | [1998/07] | French: | Dispositif de ventilation centrifuge à performances améliorées comportant au moins deux entrées d'aspiration et procédé de ventilation s'y rapportant | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 12.08.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.11.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) MC | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.09.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2003 | IE | 02.04.2003 | GR | 02.07.2003 | PT | 02.07.2003 | LU | 06.08.2003 | CH | 31.08.2003 | LI | 31.08.2003 | [2007/04] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
LU | 06.08.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.04.2003 | |
GR | 02.07.2003 | ||
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 02.07.2003 | |
PT | 02.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | PT | 02.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB130521 (WATTERSON WILLIAM ANDREW [AU]) [Y] 7 * page 3, line 20 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US2073404 (HOBBS JAMES C); | [YA]GB532758 (HOWDEN JAMES & CO LTD, et al) [Y] 5 * page 2, line 79 - line 92 * * sentence 27 - sentence 33; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,11,15; | [A]US2814432 (EISERMAN GERT V); | [XY]US3625629 (MORRISON THOMPSON, et al) [X] 1,3,9-11 * the whole document * [Y] 5,7; | [AD]DE2538066 (LTG LUFTTECHNISCHE GMBH) [AD] 1,4,11,15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5324167 (MOCZADLO RAYMOND [US], et al) [A] 4,6 * the whole document * |