EP0851070 - Flashing's support profile for a wall joint covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1999 [1999/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garcia, Guy 35, rue Paul Verlaine 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Thibault, Jean-Marc Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97420239.2 | 23.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | FR19960016234 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9616234 | [1998/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0851070 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/14 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
E04D13/1478 (EP);
E04D13/1415 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Profilträger eines Dichtungsstreifens für eine Wandanschlussverkleidung | [1998/27] | English: | Flashing's support profile for a wall joint covering | [1998/27] | French: | Profilé de support d'une bavette d'étanchéité pour un raccord sur un mur | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/39] | 21.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.02.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US3256650 (WECKERLY ET AL.) [YD] 1,2,4-9,11 * the whole document * [A] 3,10; | [Y]FR2470216 (GUERIN) [Y] 1,2,4-9,11 * page 1, line 5 - line 18; figure - *; | [A]US3359692 (DZWONKAS) [A] 1,3,10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0528771 (BILCO COMPANY) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]CA1237868 (HOULE) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2410103 (BLEFA AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB1396584 (WEDGE ROOFING) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]FR2735047 (LAHERA PRODUCTIONS) [A] 10 * abstract * |