EP0787865 - Box and system for insulation and ground drainage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.2000 [2000/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boissie, Chantal 19, rue Barthélémy Niolon 13170 Fuveau / FR | For all designated states Lucenet, Deborah 19, rue Barthélémy Niolon 13170 Fuveau / FR | For all designated states Lucenet, David 19, rue Barthélémy Niolon 13170 Fuveau / FR | [1997/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucenet, Deborah 19, rue Barthélémy Niolon 13710 Fuveau / FR | 02 /
Lucenet, David 19, rue Barthélémy Niolon 13710 Fuveau / FR | [1997/32] | Representative(s) | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie Tour Méditerranée 65 avenue Jules Cantini 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/38] | Domange, Maxime, et al Cabinet Beau de Lomenie, 232, avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [1997/32] | Somnier, Jean-Louis, et al c/o Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 232, Avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cédex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 97430003.0 | 23.01.1997 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | FR19960001367 | 30.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9601367 | [1997/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0787865 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0787865 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/80, E04B1/76, E04C2/20, E02B11/00, E02B13/00, E02D31/02 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
E04C2/20 (EP,US);
E02B11/00 (EP,US);
E02B13/00 (EP,US);
E02D31/02 (EP,US);
E04B1/762 (EP,US);
E04B1/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1997/32] | Title | German: | Kasten und System zur Wärmedämmung und Bodendränage | [1997/32] | English: | Box and system for insulation and ground drainage | [1997/32] | French: | Caisson et système isolant et de drainage de sol | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 09.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/49] | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.03.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.1997 | 10.03.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.1997 | 10.03.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   15.03.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE4021471 (STOP HOESZIGETELOEELEM GYARTO [HU]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 62; figures 1-4 * [A] 11; | [Y]FR2691726 (SCORES [FR]) [Y] 1 * page 4, line 13 - page 6, line 27 *; | [A]US4246733 (HABER TERRY M) [A] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4304609 (YUGEN KAISHA CLEAN UP SYSTEM T [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9,12,13 * figures 8,9,13 * |