EP0830999 - Articulated device for an all terrain bicycle or other wheeled or gliding vehicles enabling the lifting of the vehicles from a lower level by using a lifting installation like a ski lift [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renaudineau, Georges Rue des Myosotis 04000 Digne Les Bains / FR | For all designated states Nicolosi, Philip La Condamine 04270 Estoublon / FR | For all designated states Audran, Michel Guartin St. Jean 04510 Aiglun / FR | For all designated states Monteil, Jean-Luc 109, Chemin de la Bugadiéll 04180 Villeneuve / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Renaudineau, Georges Route de St-Jurs 04270 Estoublon / FR | ||
For all designated states Nicolosi, Philip La Condamine 04270 Estoublon / FR | |||
For all designated states Audran, Michel Guartin St. Jean 04510 Aiglun / FR | |||
For all designated states Monteil, Jean-Luc 109, Chemin de la Bugadiéll 04180 Villeneuve / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/13] | Application number, filing date | 97430025.3 | 15.09.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | FR19960011633 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: FR 9611633 | [1998/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0830999 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B61B11/00 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B61B11/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI [1998/50] |
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gelenkige Vorrichtung für geländegängige Fahrräder oder andere rollende oder gleitende Fahrzeuge, die das Hochziehen von niveauniedrigeren Fahrzeugen durch Gebrauch von Aufstieghilfen vom Typ Skilift erlaubt | [1998/13] | English: | Articulated device for an all terrain bicycle or other wheeled or gliding vehicles enabling the lifting of the vehicles from a lower level by using a lifting installation like a ski lift | [1998/13] | French: | Dispositif articulé, à adapter sur les bicyclettes tous terrains, ou autres véhicules roulants ou glissants, permettant la remontée des dénivelées par l'utilisation de remontées mécaniques de type téléski | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 01.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE1815531 (H. REY) [AD] 1 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, paragraph 2; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]DE2349322 (WAGES WALDEMAR) [AD] 1 * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE6947431U (F. WOLF) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 4, line 6; figures 1,2 * |