EP0848193 - Flow valve operated by flow transfer means which regulate small flows of control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2001 [2001/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perez Corbalan, Sergio Carlos Alvadaro, 5321 Santiago (Las Condes) / CL | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Ph. Cabinet Arbousse Bastide BP 35 67044 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe Cabinet Arbousse Bastide, 5, place du Corbeau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 97440115.0 | 20.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | US19960754257 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: US 754257 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848193 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/17, F16K31/122, F16K31/126, F16K31/383, F16K31/40 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F16K31/1266 (EP,US);
F16K1/06 (KR);
F16K31/1223 (EP,US);
F16K31/383 (EP,US);
F16K31/406 (EP,US);
F16K7/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durchflussventil das durch Regelvorrichtungen für begrenzte Durchströmungen vorgesteuert ist | [1998/25] | English: | Flow valve operated by flow transfer means which regulate small flows of control | [1998/25] | French: | Vanne commandée par des moyens de contrôle d'écoulements de débit réduit | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 18.12.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/29] | 15.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.01.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2000 | 30.11.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2980385 (HUNTER EDWIN J, et al); | [A]GB900750 (SIMON LTD HENRY) [A] 1,17 * figure 1 *; | [DA]US3493008 (SCAGLIONE PAUL J) [DA] 1,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE1775932 (SAHLIN ENG CO INC) [A] 1,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2540444 (BUCHHOLZ HYDRAULIK HELMUT BUCH) [A] 1,4,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4019712 (MARTIN HARRY F) [A] 1,17 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4211387 (GETCHELL WILLIAMS G [US], et al) [A] 1-3,17 * figure 6 *; | [A]US4276902 (ROTH VERLON C) [A] 1,4,17 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2273795 (WEINGARTEN ZVI [IL]) | by applicant | US2980385 | US3493008 | US19950545980 |