EP0800156 - Labelholder for the presentation of informations relating to objects stocked in the shelves of a warehouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Castorama, S.A. Parc d'activités 59175 Templemars / FR | [1997/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duriez, Louis 22, rue Saint Firmin 59800 Lille / FR | [1997/41] | Representative(s) | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 27bis, rue du Vieux-Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 12 Place Simon Vollant 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 97490006.0 | 01.04.1997 | [1997/41] | Priority number, date | FR19960004688 | 05.04.1996 Original published format: FR 9604688 | [1997/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0800156 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0800156 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/20, A47F5/08 | [1997/41] | CPC: |
A47F5/0869 (EP);
G09F3/204 (EP);
G09F3/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, IT, NL [1997/41] | Title | German: | Etikettenhalter zur Darstellung von Informationen über in einem Lagerregal gelagerten Gegenstände | [1997/41] | English: | Labelholder for the presentation of informations relating to objects stocked in the shelves of a warehouse | [1997/41] | French: | Dispositif porte-étiquette pour la présentation d'informations sur des articles placés dans les rayonnages d'un magasin | [1997/41] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/14] | 09.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | DYNAC TRADING, société anonyme Parc d'Activités 59175 Templemars / FR | Date: | 02.05.1998 | [1998/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]GB2149179 (SIGN & DISPLAY IND LTD) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2585549 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR1602925 | FR2584844 | GB2149179 | FR2659469 |