EP0820047 - Seal for bags and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brooks Todo Seguridad en Espana, S.A. C/. Vic, 26-28 08120 La Llagosta (Barcelona) / ES | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baucells Granell, Jaime C/Vic, 26-28 08120 La Llagosta (Barcelona) / ES | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 - 3 46018 Valencia / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1999/35] | Maldonado Jordan, Julia Linares, 7 Pta. 3 46018 Valencia / ES | ||
Former [1998/04] | Isern Jara, Jaime Avda. Pau Casals, 22 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 97500028.2 | 05.02.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | ES19960001958U | 17.07.1996 Original published format: ES 9601958 U | [1998/04] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820047 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820047 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/03, G09F3/14 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G09F3/0323 (EP,US);
G09F3/0311 (EP,US);
G09F3/14 (EP,US);
A45C13/103 (EP,US);
Y10S24/39 (US);
Y10S24/50 (US);
Y10T24/2534 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45099 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45168 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4522 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/04] | Extension states | LT | 06.02.1997 | LV | 06.02.1997 | SI | 06.02.1997 | Title | German: | Siegel für Tragetaschen oder ähnliche Artikel | [1998/04] | English: | Seal for bags and the like | [1998/04] | French: | Sceau pour valises ou articles similaires | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 12.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2000 | CH | 26.04.2000 | ES | 26.04.2000 | LI | 26.04.2000 | [2002/27] |
Former [2002/02] | AT | 26.04.2000 | |
CH | 26.04.2000 | ||
LI | 26.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 26.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0374539 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0552959 (ENVOPAK GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * |