EP0888734 - Cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lekue, S. L. C. Barcelona, 33, Poligon Industrial la Llagosta 08120 La Llagosta (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Llorente Hompanera, José Ma C. Pau Giralt, 2 08391 Tiana (Barcelona) / ES | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [1999/01] | Ponti Sales, Adelaida Consell de Cent 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 97500221.3 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | ES19970001500U | 30.05.1997 Original published format: ES 9701500 U | [1999/01] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0888734 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0888734 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/04 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
A46B7/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/24] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | LT | 19.10.1999 | LV | 19.10.1999 | SI | 19.10.1999 | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät | [1999/01] | English: | Cleaning device | [1999/01] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 19.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 06.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.03.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 21.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/31] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0573081 (ARCHENTI PENNELLI DI ARCHENTI) [X] 1,2,7 * column 1, line 24 - line 38 * * column 3, line 50 - line 53 * * figure 5 * [Y] 6,8,9; | [Y]WO9404057 (SWORDFISH INT LTD ;CONROY RICHARD NOBERT (GB)) [Y] 6 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [Y]US5112156 (BOYER RICHARD L) [Y] 8 * figure 3 * * column 2, line 57 - line 66 * * abstract *; | [Y]US4541139 (JONES DAVID A ET AL) [Y] 9 * column 5, line 52 - line 57 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3614026 (APA KG BAUDER OTTO) [A] 3-5 * column 4, line 12 - line 15 * * column 5, line 13 - line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4218804 (ARINCI GIOVANNI ET AL) [A] 3-5 * column 2, line 25 - line 39 * * column 3, line 3 - line 6 * * figures 2,6 * |