EP0798267 - Organoclay compositions manufactured with organic acid ester-derived quaternary ammonium compounds, their preparation and non-aqueous fluid systems containing such compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHEOX INTERNATIONAL, INC. Wyckoffs Mill Road Hightstown New Jersey 08520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | For all designated states RHEOX INTERNATIONAL, INC. Wyckoffs Mill Road Hightstown, New Jersey 08520 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mardis, Wilbur 45 Victoria Court Southampton, PA 18966 / US | 02 /
Sanchaz, José 10 Kenmare Drive Tabernacle, NJ 08088 / US | 03 /
Basson, Henry Gemslaan 29 3090 Overijse / BE | [1997/40] | Representative(s) | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/40] | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al F. R. Kelly & Co., 27 Clyde Road, Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97650004.1 | 18.02.1997 | [1997/40] | Priority number, date | US19960621932 | 26.03.1996 Original published format: US 621932 | [1997/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0798267 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0798267 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/44, C09D5/04, C09D9/00, C09K7/02, C10M113/16, C09D11/00, C08K3/34, C09D5/34, C09J11/04, C09K3/10, A61K7/00, C11D3/12 | [1997/40] | CPC: |
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
C01B33/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C09D7/43 (EP,US);
C09J11/04 (EP,US);
C09K3/10 (EP,US);
C09K8/145 (EP,US);
C10M113/16 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D3/1266 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K5/19 (EP,US);
C10M2201/14 (EP,US);
C10M2215/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/40] | Title | German: | Organoton-Zusammensetzungen, hergestellt mit Hilfe von quaternären Ammoniumverbindungen, welche von Estern abgeleitet sind, die Derivate von organischen Säuren darstellen, sowie ihre Herstellung und nicht-wässrige flüssige Systeme, die diese Zusammensetzungen enthalten | [1997/40] | English: | Organoclay compositions manufactured with organic acid ester-derived quaternary ammonium compounds, their preparation and non-aqueous fluid systems containing such compositions | [1997/40] | French: | Compositions organoargile préparées à l'aide de composés ammonium quaternaire dérivés d'esters d'acides organiques, leur préparation et systèmes fluides non-aqueux contenant de telles compositions | [1997/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 04.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.06.2002 | BE | 26.06.2002 | CH | 26.06.2002 | LI | 26.06.2002 | ES | 20.12.2002 | IE | 18.02.2003 | [2004/15] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
ES | 20.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
BE | 26.06.2002 | ||
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 26.06.2002 | |
CH | 26.06.2002 | ||
LI | 26.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 26.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2017072 (NL INDUSTRIES INC); | [DA]US4208218 (FINLAYSON CLAUDE M [US]); | [A]LU83759 (NL INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [A] 2,8 * claims 1,9 * * page 11, line 12 - page 12, line 16 * * claim 12 *; | [A]GB2090584 (NL INDUSTRIES INC) [A] 2,8 * claims 1,7,10 * * page 3, line 22 - line 50 * * claims 11,19,20 *; | [DA]US4412018 (FINLAYSON CLAUDE M [US], et al); | [DA]US4434075 (MARDIS WILBUR S [US], et al); | [X]DE3434983 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,9-11,8 * claim 1 * * page 6, line 5 - line 7 * * page 7, line 1 - line 4 * * page 7, line 17 - line 20 * * page 8, line 11 - line 23 * * page 9, line 1 - line 4; claim 3 *; | [X]EP0204240 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,9-11,8 * claims 1,3,4,6 * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 24 - line 28; claim 8 *; | [A]DE3806548 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [A] * page 9, line 33 - line 39 *; | [A]EP0542266 (RHEOX INT [US]); | [DA]US5336647 (NAE HEMI N [US], et al) |