EP0840465 - User interface for mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1998/19] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kivelä, Seppo Rinteentie 41 24240 Salo / FI | 02 /
Heinonen, Pekka Hakakuja 2 B 28 02100 Espoo / FI | 03 /
Savilampi, Erkki Nuolialantie 35 as 2 33900 Tampere / FI | 04 /
Okkonen, Harri Salonkitie 5 as 3 02940 Espoo / FI | 05 /
Murphy, Ciaron Kaksomäki 1 D 2 02400 Kirkkonummi / FI | 06 /
Rautila, Heikki Visamäki 5 A 9 02130 Espoo / FI | [1998/19] | Representative(s) | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Visiokatu 1 33720 Tampere / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Pursiainen, Timo Pekka Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy, Hermiankatu 12B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2003/03] | Johansson, Folke Nokia Corporation, Intellectual Property Rights, P.O. Box 226 00045 Nokia Group / FI | ||
Former [1998/19] | Lind, Robert, et al Nokia Mobile Phones Ltd., P.O. Box 100 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 97660105.4 | 06.10.1997 | [1998/19] | Priority number, date | FI19960004399 | 31.10.1996 Original published format: FI 964399 | [1998/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0840465 | Date: | 06.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0840465 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0840465 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/38, H04B1/40 | [1998/19] | CPC: |
H04B1/3833 (EP,US);
G02C11/10 (EP,US);
H04B1/38 (EP,US);
H04M1/05 (EP,US);
H04M1/6066 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04B1/385 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/37] |
Former [1998/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Benutzerschnittstelle eines Mobiltelefons | [1998/19] | English: | User interface for mobile telephone | [1998/19] | French: | Interface d'utilisateur pour un téléphone portable | [1998/19] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.2004 | IT | 29.12.2004 | NL | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.03.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.12.2004 | |
NL | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2819386 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [X] 13 * abstract *; | [X]US4647722 (NISHIDA KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,12,13,17 * abstract *; | [A]US5054051 (HOFF DON G [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [X]DE4310230 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-9,13,17 * column 3, line 14 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0665655 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 27 *; | [A]WO9623373 (HAYNES PHILIP ASHLEY [GB]) [A] 1,13,30 * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 25; figures 19-22 ** abstract * |