EP0841602 - Watch, especially pocket-watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADEVA S.A. Rte de L'Aurore 9 CH-1700 Fribourg 6 / CH | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graber, Edmund 65 rue du coteau 2500 Bienne / CH | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3013 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | BOVARD AG - Patentanwälte Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810140.0 | 13.03.1997 | [1998/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841602 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841602 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/20 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
G04B37/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Uhr, insbesondere Taschenuhr | [1998/20] | English: | Watch, especially pocket-watch | [1998/20] | French: | Montre, en particulier montre de poche | [1998/21] |
Former [1998/20] | Montre, En particulier montre de poche | Examination procedure | 01.09.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.1999 | FI | 25.08.1999 | IT | 25.08.1999 | SE | 25.08.1999 | DK | 25.11.1999 | FR | 31.03.2000 | [2008/41] |
Former [2008/07] | AT | 25.08.1999 | |
FI | 25.08.1999 | ||
IT | 25.08.1999 | ||
SE | 25.08.1999 | ||
DK | 25.11.1999 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 25.08.1999 | |
FI | 25.08.1999 | ||
SE | 25.08.1999 | ||
DK | 25.11.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 25.08.1999 | |
FI | 25.08.1999 | ||
SE | 25.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 25.08.1999 | |
FI | 25.08.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 25.08.1999 | |
FI | 26.11.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | FI | 26.11.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US222235 (BREESE) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US298615 (O'HARA) [A] 1-3,8 * page 2, line 16 - line 126; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0388138 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [A] 1* column 4, line 2 - line 44; figure 1 * |