EP0864679 - Gripper clamp for a carrying gripper and loom with a gripper clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SULZER TEXTIL AG Joweid Zentrum 8630 Rüti / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Sulzer Textil AG Joweid Zentrum 8630 Rüti / CH | ||
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states SULZER RÜTI AG Caspar Honegger-Strasse CH-8630 Rüti / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüegg, Robert Walderstrasse 129 8340 Hadlikon / CH | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Sulzer Management AG KS/Patente/0007 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [1998/38] | Heubeck, Bernhard Sulzer Management AG, KS Patente/0007, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810149.1 | 14.03.1997 | [1998/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0864679 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0864679 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D47/23 | [1998/38] | CPC: |
D03D47/23 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, IT [1999/27] |
Former [1999/21] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Greiferklemme für einen Bringergreifer und Webmaschine mit Greiferklemme | [1998/38] | English: | Gripper clamp for a carrying gripper and loom with a gripper clamp | [1998/38] | French: | Pince de griffe pour une griffe d'amenée et métier à tisser avec une pince de griffe | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 17.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 20.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1571925 (RAMON BALAGUER GOLOBART); | [A]EP0115238 (ALSACIENNE CONSTR MAT TEX [FR]); | [A]EP0207533 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [A]EP0584429 (SULZER AG [CH]) |