EP0803888 - Disconnecting switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2002/15] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states ABB Hochspannungstechnik AG Brown-Boveri-Strasse 5 8050 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Haselstrasse 16 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Füchsle, Dieter Buckstrasse 50 5304 Endingen / CH | 02 /
Zbinden, Markus Casinostrasse 3 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [1997/44] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2000/25] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Business Services Ltd. (SLE-I) Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1997/44] | Kaiser, Helmut, Dr., et al Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht (TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810153.3 | 17.03.1997 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | DE19961015912 | 22.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19615912 | [1997/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0803888 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0803888 | Date: | 07.04.1999 | [1999/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803888 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01H31/20, H02B13/035, H01H33/02 | [1999/12] | CPC: |
H01H3/42 (EP,US);
H01H31/32 (EP,US);
H02B13/035 (EP,US);
H01H31/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/44] | H01H31/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1997/44] | Title | German: | Trennschalter | [1997/44] | English: | Disconnecting switch | [1997/44] | French: | Interrupteur-séparateur | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 17.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2838373 (HERMLE EDUARD) [Y] 1-3; | [Y]DE3035870 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH])[Y] 1-3 |