EP0818578 - Cover for a manhole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Von Roll Holding AG Bahnhofstrasse 4563 Gerlafingen / CH | [1998/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calvanetto, François Le Lomont 7 2942 Alle / CH | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Bollhalder, Renato, et al Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Bollhalder, Renato, et al BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/35] | Bollhalder, Renato, et al Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1998/03] | Ullrich, Gerhard, Dr., et al A. Braun, Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810155.8 | 17.03.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | CH19960001751 | 11.07.1996 Original published format: CH 175196 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818578 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818578 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1998/03] | Title | German: | Abdeckung für eine Bodenöffnung | [1998/03] | English: | Cover for a manhole | [1998/03] | French: | Couvercle pour regard | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/32] | 16.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0341332 (VON ROLL AG [CH]) [DA] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0538115 (A3C METAL [FR]) [A] 9,10* column 2, line 43 - column 6, line 3; figures 1-8 * |