EP0808562 - Device and method for processing a fatty mass with a certain proportion of water, such as butter or margarine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2000 [2000/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EGLI AG MASCHINEN- UND APPARATEBAU Kreuz 9606 Bütschwil / CH | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egli, Rudenz Bahnhofstrasse 13 9606 Bütschwil / CH | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Hepp, Dieter, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810291.1 | 09.05.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | CH19960001301 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: CH 130196 | [1997/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808562 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A01J17/00, A23D7/05 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
A01J17/00 (EP);
A23D7/05 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, LI, NL, SE [1997/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer fetthaltigen Massa mit einem bestimmten Wasseranteil, wie Butter oder Margarine | [1997/48] | English: | Device and method for processing a fatty mass with a certain proportion of water, such as butter or margarine | [1997/48] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour travailler une masse graisseuse à teneur déterminée en eau, telle que le beurre ou la margarine | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 01.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/23] | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR486476 (RYDBERG) [A] 1 * page 1, line 29 - line 57 * * page 2, line 12 - line 66 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR983837 (LEVER BROTHERS & UNILEVER) [A] 1 * page 3, column 2, paragraph 2; figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR1068555 (AKTIEBOLAGET SEPARATOR) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0394013 (AULT FOODS ;INVESTISSEMENTS MONGEAU INC (CA)) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |