EP0827198 - Metal ceramic substrates for semiconductors of high reliability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dowa Mining Co., Ltd. 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Dowa Mining Co., Ltd. 8-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakuraba, Masami c/o Dowa Mining Co., Ltd, 8-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Masami c/o Dowa Mining Co., Ltd, 8-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Junji c/o Dowa Mining Co., Ltd, 8-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takahara, Masaya c/o Dowa Mining Co., Ltd, 8-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810603.7 | 27.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | JP19960244076 | 27.08.1996 Original published format: JP 24407696 | JP19970084389 | 18.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8438997 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0827198 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0827198 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827198 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/14, H01L23/367, H01L23/373 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
C04B37/026 (EP,US);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/15 (EP,US);
H05K1/0271 (EP,US);
C04B2237/124 (EP,US);
C04B2237/125 (EP,US);
C04B2237/127 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
C04B2237/366 (EP,US);
C04B2237/407 (EP,US);
C04B2237/70 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/098 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09845 (EP,US);
H05K3/38 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/13] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Metall-Keramik-Substrate von hoher Zuverlässigkeit für Halbleiter | [1998/10] | English: | Metal ceramic substrates for semiconductors of high reliability | [1998/10] | French: | Substrats métallo-céramiques de fiabilité améliorée pour semi-conducteurs | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 16.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH | 06.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 29.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04012282.2 / EP1453089 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05347469 ; | [X]WO8900339 (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 6, line 19 - line 25; figure 6 *; | [X]EP0407905 (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 44; figures 2,3 *; | [PXA]EP0789397 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * page 7, line 25 - line 28; figure 10A; claims 1-10 * [PA] 5 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940331), vol. 018, no. 188, Database accession no. (E - 1532), & JP05347469 A 19931227 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |