EP0916820 - Method of operating a petrol engine and petrol engine for using the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.1999 [1999/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flamina Holding AG Residenz Park, Industriestrasse 16 6300 Zug / CH | [1999/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
May, Michael Flamina Holding AG Residenz Park Industriestrasse 16, 6300 Zug / CH | [1999/20] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/20] | AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 97810859.5 | 11.11.1997 | [1999/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0916820 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02B7/02, F02B17/00 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
F02B7/02 (EP);
F02B17/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Benzinmotors und Benzinmotor zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1999/20] | English: | Method of operating a petrol engine and petrol engine for using the method | [1999/20] | French: | Procédé d'actionnement d'un moteur à combustion à pétrole et moteur pour l'exécution de ce procédé | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8604111 (GREENHOUGH JOHN HEATH) [X] 1,4,6 * figures 2-6 * * page 5, line 1 - line 4 * * page 7, line 15 - line 19 * * page 7, line 20 - line 27 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 8 * * page 15, line 2 - line 4 * * page 17, line 8 - line 21 * * page 17, line 27 - line 29 *; | [XA]GB878278 (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE, DES CARBURANTS ET LUBRIFIANTS) [X] 1 * page 1, line 23 - line 31 * * page 2, line 59 - line 112 * * claims 2-4 * [A] 3; | [A]EP0236057 (COVENTRY CITY COUNCIL) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract * * figure 20 * * column 10, line 30 - line 63 * * column 11, line 36 - column 14, line 48 *; | [A]US4539948 (TOEPEL RICHARD R) [A] 1,2,7 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 14 * * column 4, line 33 - line 52 * * column 5, line 5 - line 15 *; | [A]JPH09217641 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 097, no. 012, & JP09217641 A 19970819 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * | [A] - MIKULIC L A ET AL, "SEQUENTIELLE EINSPRITZSTRATEGIEN FUER VERBRAUCHSOPTIMIERTE OTTOMOTORKONZEPTE", MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, (19900701), vol. 51, no. 7 / 08, pages 286 - 293, XP000147933 [A] 1 * figure 2 * * page 288, column 3, paragraphs 1-4 * * figure 4 * * page 228, paragraph 5 - page 290, paragraph 1 * | [DA] - J.M.MASON,JR AND H.E.HESSELBERG, "ENGINE KNOCK AS INFLUENCED BY PRECOMBUSTION REACTIONS", SAE TRANSACTIONS, (19531106), vol. 61, pages 141 - 150, XP002060396 [DA] 1,4 * page 141, column 1, paragraph 7 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 148, column 1, paragraph 5 - column 2, paragraph 2 * | [DA] - M.W.CORZILIUS,D.R.DIGGS, AND D.L.PASTELL, "SOME FACTORS AFFECTINGPRECOMBUSTION REACTIONS IN ENGINES", SAE TRANSACTIONS, (19521106), vol. 61, pages 386 - 401, XP002060397 [DA] 1,4 * figure 21 * * page 395, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 397, column 1, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | - M.V. CORZILIUS ET AL., "SOME FACTORS AFFECTING PRECOMBUSTION REACTIONS IN ENGINES", SAE TRANSACTION, (1952), vol. 61, page 386-401 | - J.M. MASON, H.E. HESSELBERG, "ENGINE KNOCK AS INFLUENCED BY PRECOMBUSTIO REACTIONS", SAE TRANSACTIONS, (1954), vol. 62, page 141-150 |