EP0933421 - Compact phosphate-free cleaning tablets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/31] | Compact phosphate-free washing and cleaning tablets | ||
[2006/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIFA AG FRENKENDORF Rheinstrasse 99 CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | [2006/47] |
Former [1999/31] | For all designated states MIFA AG FRENKENDORF Rheinstrasse 99 CH-4402 Frenkendorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleeli, Karin Bodenacherstrasse 103 8121 Benglen / CH | 02 /
Eggenschwiler, Hans Kirchweg 4448 Läufelfingen / CH | 03 /
Gitzi, Rudolf Rieselbrunnackerweg 10 4203 Grellingen / CH | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil E. BLUM & Co. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Blum, Rudolf Emil Ernst c/o E. Blum & Co Patentanwälte Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 97811000.5 | 18.12.1997 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0933421 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933421 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00, C11D11/00 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C11D3/08 (EP);
C11D17/0034 (EP);
C11D17/0082 (EP);
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/128 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] |
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kompakte, phosphatfreie Reinigungsmitteltablette | [2006/47] | English: | Compact phosphate-free cleaning tablets | [2006/47] | French: | Produits de nettoyage en comprimés compacts sans phosphate | [2006/47] |
Former [1999/31] | Kompakte, phosphatfreie Waschmittel- bzw. Reinigungsmitteltablette | ||
Former [1999/31] | Compact phosphate-free washing and cleaning tablets | ||
Former [1999/31] | Produits de lavage et de nettoyage en comprimés compacts sans phosphate | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 05.02.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR, MC | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | LU | 18.12.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/07] | IE | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | NL | 22.11.2006 | |
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0466484 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11,18 * page 2, line 50 - page 8, line 30; examples 1-15 *; | [XY]EP0711828 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,17,18 * page 2, line 25 - page 6, line 30; examples 1,2,5 * [Y] 12,13,15,16; | [Y]WO9722685 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 12 * page 4, line 3 - page 8, line 24; examples I-VI *; | [Y]DE19601841 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 12,13,15,16 * page 2, line 44 - page 2, line 48 * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 35 *; | [A]DE19606765 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-4,8,10,11* column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 38 * |