EP0808593 - High chair with variable configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azur P.A.M.O.M. Via Montelfi 8, Loc. Campogiallo 50064 Incisa Valdarno (Firenze) / IT | [1997/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerchiaro, Walter Via Montelfi 8 50064 Incisa Valdarno (FI), Campogiallo / IT | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830133.1 | 24.03.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | IT1996FI00122 | 22.05.1996 Original published format: IT FI960122 | [1997/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0808593 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0808593 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47D1/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
A47D1/004 (EP,US);
A47D1/0085 (EP,US);
A47D1/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1997/48] | Extension states | SI | 08.04.1997 | Title | German: | Hochstuhl mit verschiedenen Konfigurationen | [1997/48] | English: | High chair with variable configuration | [1997/48] | French: | Chaise haute à configuration variable | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 30.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2115322 (KUCHENBECKER) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 2,9,12; | [A]US4109961 (OPSVIK PETER) [A] 1,2,9 * column 1, line 43 - line 47 *; | [AY]DE9003042U (HILGERS-SILBERBERG, J.) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1; figures 2,3; claim 1 * [Y] 2,9,12; | [A]EP0387764 (RHO GIANFRANCO [IT], et al) [A] 11,12 * column 3, line 21 - line 23; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9428771 (HINGE THOMAS [DK]) [A] 1* page 4, line 2 - line 6; figure 6 *; | [PXY]EP0726045 (MOLL SYS & FUNKTIONS MOEBEL [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 17 - line 37; figures 1,5 * [Y] 2,9,12 |