EP0887938 - A/D converter testing structure, particularly for successive approximation A/D converters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brasca, Paolo Via Luigi Castiglioni, 3 20100 Milano / IT | 02 /
Casarsa, Marco Via Q.Divona, 48/A 20062 Cassano d'Adda / IT | 03 /
Pezzini, Saverio Via Istria, 5 20059 Vimercate / IT | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830304.8 | 27.06.1997 | [1999/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0887938 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/10 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
H03M1/108 (EP);
H03M1/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/36] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Teststruktur für Analog-Digitalwandler, insbesondere für Analog-Digitalwandler mit schrittweiser Annäherung | [1999/01] | English: | A/D converter testing structure, particularly for successive approximation A/D converters | [1999/01] | French: | Structure de test de convertisseurs A/N, en particulier de convertisseurs A/N à approximations successives | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4215740 (GOLD STAR ELECTRONICS) [X] 1-3,7,11,12,14,16 * abstract *; | [X]JPH06164391 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940909), vol. 018, no. 486, Database accession no. (E - 1604), & JP06164391 A 19940610 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,4-6,8-13,15 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 28, Database accession no. 94-229104 [ ] * abstract * | [XA] - LYON J A ET AL, "TESTABILITY FEATURES OF THE 68HC16Z1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE, NASHVILLE, OCT. 28 - 30, 1991, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19910101), pages 122 - 130, XP000272242 [X] 1 * page 123, paragraph L * * page 128, column R - page 129, column L * [A] 7,9 |