EP0905020 - Rigid, jointed piping for conditioning an aircraft in advance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sefind Servizi e Forniture Industriali s.r.l. Piazza dell'Alberone, 20 00181 Roma / IT | [1999/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pietropaoli, Paolo Piazza dell'Alberone, 20 00181 Roma / IT | [1999/13] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1999/13] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830483.0 | 30.09.1997 | [1999/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0905020 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0905020 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/00 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
B64F1/362 (EP);
Y02T50/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/13] | Extension states | RO | 29.09.1999 | Title | German: | Starre Rohre zur Klimatisierung eines Flugzeuges | [1999/13] | English: | Rigid, jointed piping for conditioning an aircraft in advance | [1999/13] | French: | Tuyaux rigides pour le conditionnement d'air d'un avion | [1999/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 18.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2004 | CH | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | LI | 15.12.2004 | NL | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
NL | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 15.12.2004 | |
CH | 15.12.2004 | ||
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
LI | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4572550 (HARDER HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 62 - line 65 * * column 3, line 21 - line 27 * * column 3, line 39 - line 44 * [A] 2,4; | [A]US4632019 (WHITEMAN GARY D [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]US4844533 (DOWD JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 27 * [A] 2,3; | [A]EP0621175 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 8 - line 20 * | Examination | US4844133 |