EP0917081 - Maxicode locating method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.P.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.p.A. Via Candini 2 40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | ||
Former [1999/20] | For all designated states DATALOGIC S.P.A. Via Candini 2 I-40012 Lippo di Calderara di Reno (Bologna) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saporetti, Claudio Via Pablo Neruda 11 40139 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Amorosi, Stefano Via Piave 33 40133 Bologna / IT | [1999/35] |
Former [1999/20] | 01 /
Saporetti, Claudio Via Pablo Neruda 11 40139 Bologna / IT | ||
02 /
Amoresi, Stefano Via Piave 33 40133 Bologna / IT | Representative(s) | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Riccardi, Elisa, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Viale Sabotino 19/2 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1999/20] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830608.2 | 17.11.1997 | [1999/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0917081 | Date: | 19.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0917081 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00, G06K19/06 | [1999/20] | CPC: |
G06K19/06131 (EP,US);
G06K19/06037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1999/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Maxicode-Lokalisierungsverfahren | [1999/20] | English: | Maxicode locating method | [1999/20] | French: | Méthode de localisation d'un Maxicode | [1999/20] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/51] | 22.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.10.2001 | BE | 10.10.2001 | CH | 10.10.2001 | LI | 10.10.2001 | NL | 10.10.2001 | DK | 10.01.2002 | PT | 10.01.2002 | SE | 10.01.2002 | ES | 30.04.2002 | [2004/04] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
DK | 10.01.2002 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 10.10.2001 | |
BE | 10.10.2001 | ||
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 10.10.2001 | |
CH | 10.10.2001 | ||
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
NL | 10.10.2001 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 10.10.2001 | |
LI | 10.10.2001 | ||
PT | 10.01.2002 | ||
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/48] | PT | 10.01.2002 | |
SE | 10.01.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 10.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9534043 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-15,20 * page 8, line 7 - page 11, line 34 * * page 12, line 3 - line 6 * * page 12, line 14 - page 14, line 19 *; | [A]US5637849 (WANG YNJIUN P [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 61 - column 5, line 23 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 11 * * figure 4A *; | [A]DE19705747 (INTERMEC CORP [US]) [A] 1,18,19 * page 2, line 62 - page 3, line 15 ** figure - * |