EP0924280 - Thermosetting adhesive composition based on condensed tannins and use thereof in the wood industry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silva S.r.l. Via Riviera 197 12087 Pamparato (Cuneo) / IT | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trosa, Alessandro Via Marenco 1 12080 San Michele Mondovi' (Cuneo) / IT | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830672.8 | 15.12.1997 | [1999/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924280 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924280 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J161/00, B27G11/00 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
C09J161/28 (EP);
C08L61/24 (EP);
C08L61/28 (EP);
C09J161/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Warmehärtbare Klebstoffe aus kondensierten Tanninen und Verwendung in der Holzindustrie | [2004/04] | English: | Thermosetting adhesive composition based on condensed tannins and use thereof in the wood industry | [1999/25] | French: | Composition adhésive thermodurcissable à base des tannins condensés et son utilisation dans l'industrie du bois | [2004/04] |
Former [1999/25] | Warmehärtbare Klebstoffe aus kondensierten Tannine und Verwendung in die Holzindustrie | ||
Former [1999/25] | Composition adhésive thermodurcissable à base de tannin condensé et son utilisation dans l'industrie du bois | Examination procedure | 10.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 26.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, MC, SE | 07.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.08.2004 | DK | 11.11.2004 | GR | 11.11.2004 | ES | 22.11.2004 | PT | 11.01.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/24] | NL | 11.08.2004 | |
DK | 11.11.2004 | ||
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | DK | 11.11.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
ES | 22.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | DK | 11.11.2004 | |
GR | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 11.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5480340 ; | [X]JPS5167334 ; | [X]JPS54148697 ; | [X]JPS60173074 ; | [X]US4174980 (HOWELL JOHN K JR [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 47 *; | [A]US5200447 (DIETER JERRY A [US], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]EP0699510 (SCHLINGMANN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,19 * page 3, lines 25-36; claim 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 79, no. 32, Database accession no. 79-58743B, XP002064852 & JPS5480340 A 00000000 (AGENCY OF IND SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,4,5,19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 76, no. 30, Database accession no. 76-56861X, XP002064853 & JPS5167334 A 00000000 (HOHNEN OIL KK) [X] 1,4,5,19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 01, Database accession no. 80-00919C, XP002064854 & JPS54148697 A 00000000 (HOHNEN OIL KK) [X] 1,3-5,19 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 42, Database accession no. 85-259677, XP002064855 & JPS60173074 A 00000000 (SHOEI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,3-5,19 * abstract * |