EP0926363 - A system for fixing the sheath of a "Bowden" cable to a reaction element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Automotive Products (Italia) S.p.A. Corso Marconi, 160 17014 Cairo Montenotte (Savona) / IT | [1999/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giardina Vincenzo via 1o Maggio, 6 17014 Cairo Montenotte Savona / IT | 02 /
Matteis, Davide Via Rocchetta, 2/2 17010 Cengio Savona / IT | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830688.4 | 19.12.1997 | [1999/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0926363 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/00, F16C1/26 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
F16C1/262 (EP);
B60T11/046 (EP);
F16D2125/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/10] |
Former [1999/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem einer Bowdenzugführungshülle an ein Reaktionselement | [1999/26] | English: | A system for fixing the sheath of a "Bowden" cable to a reaction element | [1999/26] | French: | Système de fixation d'une gaine de guidage "Bowden" à un élément de réaction | [1999/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/36] | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.02.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0482739 (TELEFLEX INC) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2644863 (PEUGEOT ;CITROEN SA (FR)) [X] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US3139768 (D.L. BIESECKER) [A] 3-5 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4621937 (MACCUAIG STUART J) [A] 6 * column 2, line 23 - line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2381937 (DBA); | [A]FR2532381 (JACOTTET SA ETS P); | [A]DE2005517 (ROOTES MOTORS LTD) |