EP0927952 - Digital image color correction device employing fuzzy logic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Srl Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20041 Agrate Brianza (Milano) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colla, Federica Via Meneghezzi, 9 26013 Crema (Cremona) / IT | 02 /
Mancuso, Massimo Via Oriani, 19 20052 Monza (Milan) / IT | 03 /
Poluzzi, Rinaldo Piazza Istria, 2 20100 Milan / IT | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97830730.4 | 30.12.1997 | [1999/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927952 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0927952 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, G06T7/40 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
H04N9/643 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
H04N1/628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/11] |
Former [1999/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gerät zur Farbkorrektur von digitaler Bilder mit Fuzzy-Logik | [2002/30] | English: | Digital image color correction device employing fuzzy logic | [1999/27] | French: | Correction de couleur d'image digitale avec logique floue | [1999/27] |
Former [1999/27] | Gerät zur Farbekorrektion von digitalen Bild mit Fuzzy-Logik | Examination procedure | 27.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.05.2003 | DE | 08.08.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/23] | DE | 08.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04167866 ; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920930), vol. 016, no. 472, Database accession no. (E - 1272), & JP04167866 A 19920615 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - MIYAKE Y ET AL, "FACIAL PATTERN DETECTION AND COLOR CORRECTION FROM TELEVISION PICTURE FOR NEWSPAPER PRINTING", JOURNAL OF IMAGING TECHNOLOGY, (19901001), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 165 - 169, XP000167932 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - FUJIWARA E.A., "IMAGE PROCESSING USING FUZZY LOGIC FOR A VIDEO PRINT SYSTEM", FUZZY ENGINEERING TOWARD HUMAN FRIENDLY SYSTEMS, AMSTERDAM NL, (19911113), pages 1003 - 1012, XP002065310 [A] 1 * page 1007, line 4 - page 1010, line 6 * |