|
04.09.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2007 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2007 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2007 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.09.2007 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
5 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.2007 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2007 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.2007 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.12.2006 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2006 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.2005 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2005 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.2005 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.2005 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.08.2005 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.05.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2003 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2003 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2003 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2003 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.01.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
21.03.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2001 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2001 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Filing of a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.08.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2001 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.01.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.1999 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.1999 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.1999 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1998 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.1998 |
Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1998 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |