EP0822262 - Process for producing a fructose syrup rich in fructose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAFFINERIE TIRLEMONTOISE Avenue de Tervuren 182 1150 Bruxelles / BE | [1998/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Leenheer Leen Jezus-Eiklaan, 64 3080 Tervuren / BE | 02 /
Booten Karl Glabbeekstraat, 106 3450 Geetbets / BE | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Joëlle pronovem - Office Van Malderen Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Van Malderen, Joelle Office Van Malderen, Place Reine Fabiola 6/1 1083 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 97870111.8 | 25.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | BE19960000677 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: BE 9600677 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822262 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C13K11/00, C12P19/14 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
C12P19/14 (EP);
C13K11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/42] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Fruktosesirup mit einem hohen Gehalt an Fruktose | [1998/06] | English: | Process for producing a fructose syrup rich in fructose | [1998/06] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un sirop de fructose riche en fructose | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1997 | Examination requested [1998/06] | 05.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/09] | 23.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2504939 (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 2, lines 5-12 * * page 2, lines 34-38 * * page 3 * * page 6, lines 4-16 * * page 9, line 35 - page 10, line 4 * * page 14; table . * * example 6; claim - *; | [X]EP0177477 (WALLONE REGION [BE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * page 1, lines 26-31 * * page 7, lines 4-6; figure 4; example 2; claims 4-7 *; | [A]EP0011350 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [A] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2485339 (BEGHIN SAY SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - T.NAKAMURA ET AL., "Continuous production of fructose syrups from inulin by immobilized inulinase from Aspergillus niger Mutant 817", JOURNAL OF FERMENTATION AND BIOENGINEERING, (1995), vol. 80, no. 2, pages 164 - 169, XP002048211 [X] 1-5,7,9,10 * page 164, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 166, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 166, column 1, paragraph 5 - page 167, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0922-338X(95)93213-4 |