EP0879594 - Soap composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "Galenco" Tervantstrasse 21 3583 Paal / BE | [1998/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vandamme, Patricia Kievitenlaan 108 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE | 02 /
Caers, Els Spoorwegstraat 1 3945 Ham / BE | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen, Patent Attorneys, Rue de Livourne 7 1060 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 97870132.4 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | BE19970000439 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: BE 9700439 | [1998/48] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879594 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/50, A61K7/48 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/39 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Extension states | AL | 21.05.1999 | LT | 21.05.1999 | LV | 21.05.1999 | RO | 21.05.1999 | SI | 21.05.1999 | Title | German: | Seife Zusammensetzung | [1998/48] | English: | Soap composition | [1998/48] | French: | Composition à base de savon | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/29] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 10.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.12.1999 | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4305069 (BEIERSDORF) [X] 1,4,9 * claims 1-7 * * page 4, lines 29-48 *; | [X]EP0519727 (UNILEVER) [X] 1,4,8 * claim 1 * * page 6, lines 36-43 *; | [X]EP0550779 (SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE) [X] 1-4,7 * claims 1-3 * * page 2, lines 36-39 * * page 4 * * examples 3-6,8 * |