EP0834609 - Fabric for the manufacture of a garment and process for the manufacture of this fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tiroler Loden GmbH General-Eccher-Strasse 3 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [1998/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurner, Albert Erzherzog-Eugen-Strasse 7 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 97890178.3 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | AT19960001651 | 18.09.1996 Original published format: AT 165196 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834609 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | D03D11/00 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
D03D11/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3195 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3228 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3244 (EP,US);
Y10T442/3472 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/15] | Title | German: | Gewebe zur Herstellung von Bekleidung sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gewebes | [1998/15] | English: | Fabric for the manufacture of a garment and process for the manufacture of this fabric | [1998/15] | French: | Tissu pour la fabrication d'un revêtement ainsi que procédé pour la fabrication d'un tissu | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 18.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/39] | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA1076928 (WHEELABRATOR CANADA) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-11 * figures 1,2; claims 1,7-11 *; | [A]EP0144530 (WANGNER GMBH CO KG HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,6,9-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5052448 (GIVIN WILLIAM R [US]); | [A]US5219004 (CHIU KAI F [US]); | [X]DE9315978U (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * figure 1; claim 1 * |