EP0874726 - RAPID PROTOTYPING PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF INDUSTRIAL PARTS AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allanic, André-Luc 5, place des Vosges 54000 Nancy / FR | For all designated states Schaeffer, Jean-Philippe Maison Forestière 54700 Atton / FR | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Peuscet, Jacques Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Peuscet, Jacques SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 78, avenue Raymond Poincaré 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 97900219.3 | 02.01.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997FR00001 | Priority number, date | FR19960000107 | 03.01.1996 Original published format: FR 9600107 | [1998/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9725194 | Date: | 17.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0874726 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0874726 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00, B29C41/12 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
B29C64/129 (EP,US);
B29C35/08 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | PROTOTYP-SCHNELLBAUVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR DESSEN AUSFÜHRUNG | [1998/45] | English: | RAPID PROTOTYPING PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF INDUSTRIAL PARTS AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH PROCESS | [1998/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE PROTOTYPAGE RAPIDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PIECES INDUSTRIELLES ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 16.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2000 | FI | 29.03.2000 | NL | 29.03.2000 | SE | 29.03.2000 | DK | 29.06.2000 | PT | 29.06.2000 | GR | 30.06.2000 | [2005/01] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
NL | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 29.06.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
NL | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
IE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 29.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0431924 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [DXY]EP0484182 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) [DX] 9,11 * column 17 - column 19; figures 1,15 * [Y] 1,2,4,10; | [Y]US5204124 (SECRETAN STANLEY [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * column W *; | [Y]US5204823 (SCHLOTTERBECK DAVID L [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-14 * column W *; | [A]EP0554033 (PRINZ FRITZ B [US], et al) [A] 2,4,7,8,10,15 * column W *; | [DY]WO9325377 (LASER 3D [FR], et al) [DY] 1,2,4-14 * page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 6; figures 9,12,13; claim - *; | [Y]DE9319405U (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM INFORMATIK A [DE]) [Y] 10 * the whole document * |