EP0955896 - SURGICAL IMPLEMENT PARTICULARLY USEFUL FOR IMPLANTING PROSTHETIC HEART VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.M.T.(Medical Technologies) Ltd. 37 Shaul Hamelech Boulevard 54928 Tel Aviv / IL | [1999/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVIL, Joel 13 Nachal Kidron 47314 Ramat Hasharon / IL | [1999/46] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 97900414.0 | 23.01.1997 | [1999/46] | WO1997IL00030 | Priority number, date | IL19960116891 | 24.01.1996 Original published format: IL 11689196 | US19960640149 | 30.04.1996 Original published format: US 640149 | US19960712680 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: US 712680 | [1999/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9726829 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0955896 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [1999/46] | CPC: |
A61F2/2427 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00243 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
Y10S623/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/46] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINPFLANZUNG VON HERZKLAPPENPROTHESEN | [1999/46] | English: | SURGICAL IMPLEMENT PARTICULARLY USEFUL FOR IMPLANTING PROSTHETIC HEART VALVES | [1999/46] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL PARTICULIEREMENT UTILE POUR L'IMPLANTATION DE VALVULES CARDIAQUES PROTETIQUES | [1999/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 12.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/46] | 21.10.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]SU1736446 (INST SERDECHNO SOSUDISTOJ KHIR [SU]); | [X]US4702250 (OVIL YOEL [IL], et al); | [XP]US5569300 (REDMON HENRY A [US]) |