EP0882786 - HIGH-DENSITY POWDERED DETERGENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku, Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shu Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 02 /
HAYASHI, Hiromitsu Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 03 /
TSUMADORI, Masaki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMURA, Masaaki Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | 05 /
MORIYAMA, Noboru Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334, Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640 / JP | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Kindler, Matthias, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Kindler, Matthias, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97900464.5 | 21.01.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997JP00110 | Priority number, date | JP19960008559 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: JP 855996 | JP19960033787 | 21.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3378796 | JP19960098176 | 19.04.1996 Original published format: JP 9817696 | [1998/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727278 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0882786 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0882786 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.07.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/83, C11D3/33, C11D3/08, C11D3/37, C11D17/06, C11D3/12, // C11D1:04, C11D1:14, C11D1:22, C11D1:28, C11D1:29, C11D1:72 | [1999/16] | CPC: |
C11D17/065 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D3/128 (EP,US);
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
C11D1/04 (EP,US);
C11D1/146 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1998/50] | C11D1/83, C11D3/33, C11D3/08, C11D3/37, C11D17/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/50] | Title | German: | PULVERFORMIGE WASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT HOHEM SCHUTTGEWICHT | [1998/50] | English: | HIGH-DENSITY POWDERED DETERGENT COMPOSITION | [1998/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DETERGENT PULVERULENTE HAUTE DENSITE | [1998/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1998 | Translation filed | 20.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Search fee paid | 20.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19543162 (BASF AG [DE]) [E] 1-5 * page 7, line 56 - line 61 * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 30 * * page 4, line 38 - page 5, line 3 ** claims 1,8 * | International search | [Y]JPS5851994B ; | [A]JPH02163200 (BASF AG); | [A]JPH02229894 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JPH069999 (KAO CORP); | [Y]WO9429421 (BASF AG [DE], et al) | Examination | WO9719159 |