EP0876637 - MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE OPTICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF A DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autronic-Melchers GmbH An der Rossweid 18 76229 Karlsruhe / DE | [1998/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Michael Marie-Alexandra-Strasse 44 D-76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [1998/46] | Application number, filing date | 97900581.6 | 09.01.1997 | [1998/46] | WO1997EP00065 | Priority number, date | DE1996102862 | 28.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19602862 | [1998/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727510 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0876637 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0876637 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
G01J1/4228 (EP);
G01J1/04 (EP);
G01J1/0425 (EP);
G01J3/02 (EP);
G01J3/0218 (EP);
G01N21/55 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1998/46] | Title | German: | MESSEINRICHTUNG FÜR OPTISCHE EIGENSCHAFTEN EINER ANZEIGE | [1998/46] | English: | MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE OPTICAL CHARACTERISTICS OF A DISPLAY | [1998/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DES PROPRIETES OPTIQUES D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [1998/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 05.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2000 | 31.01.2001 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 09.01.2002 | [2008/07] | Cited in | International search | [DY]EP0286529 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [DY] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 48; figures 4,5 *; | [Y]US4272196 (INDEBETOUW GUY) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 18 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [PA]EP0721136 (ELDIM [FR]) [PA] 2 * abstract * | [DY] - K.MIYOSHI ET AL., "Time Dependent Observation of the Conoscopic Figures of Twisted Liquid Crystal", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (198210), vol. 21, no. 10, pages L616 - L618, XP002028154 [DY] 1 * page L616, column L, paragraph L; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.21.1032 |