EP0821763 - ELECTRICALLY-OPERATED SEALED COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | 16.12.2005 | Change - no opposition filed | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | 16.12.2005 | Change - priority | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION COMPANY 3-1-2, Nojihigashi 2-chome Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION COMPANY 3-1-2, Nojihigashi 2-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga 525-8555 / JP | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION COMPANY 2-5, Takaidahondori 4-chome Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Yasuhiko 33-14, Shouyoudai 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | 02 /
KITA, Ichiro 754-2, Tawaramoto-cho Shiki-gun, Nara 636-03 / JP | 03 /
UMEOKA, Ikutomo 13-34-810, Tomiomotomachi 1-chome Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97900751.5 | 22.01.1997 | [1998/06] | WO1997JP00130 | Priority number, date | JP19960008896 | 23.01.1996 Original published format: JP 889696 | JP19960037726 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3772696 | JP19960037730 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 3773096 | [2006/05] |
Former [1998/06] | JP19960000088 | 23.01.1996 | |
JP19960037726 | 26.02.1996 | ||
JP19960037730 | 26.02.1996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9727402 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821763 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821763 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0821763 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/00, F04B39/10 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
F04B39/0066 (EP,US);
F04B39/0055 (EP,US);
F04B39/0072 (EP,US);
F04B39/1073 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/06] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH ANGETRIEBENER HERMETISCH GEKAPSELTER VERDICHTER | [1998/06] | English: | ELECTRICALLY-OPERATED SEALED COMPRESSOR | [1998/06] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ETANCHE A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE | [1998/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1997 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.1997 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03001476.5 / EP1304480 | EP03001487.2 / EP1304481 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0582712 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 21 - column 5, line 5; figure - *; | [A]US5213125 (LEU SHAWN A) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 62; figure - *; | [A]US4813852 (IKEDA ET AL.) [A] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 17; figure - *; | [A]US5328338 (HIRANO YUTAKA ET AL) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 13, line 23 - line 33; figure 20 *; | [A]JPS62218683 ; | [XY]US4239461 (ELSON JOHN P) [X] 13,14,16,18,20,21 * column 2, line 15 - column 5, line 17; figure - * [Y] 15,19; | [Y]US5129793 (BLASS JAROSLAV ET AL) [Y] 15,19 * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [A]GB2118256 (NECCHI SPA) [A] 13,18 * page 1, line 78 - line 116; figure - *; | [A]EP0561383 (ZANUSSI ELETTROMECC) [A] 13,18 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 41; figure - *; | [PA]US5584674 (MO JIN-YONG) [PA] 13,18 * column 3, line 33 - column 6, line 30; figure - *; | [A]US2297046 (BOURNE) [A] 13,18 * figure -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880311), vol. 012, no. 078, Database accession no. (M - 675), & JP62218683 A 19870926 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * |