EP0875123 - ATM NETWORK WITH RING ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Canada Inc. 600 March Road P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, ON K2K 2E6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Alcatel Canada Inc. 600 March Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, Ontario K2K 2E6 / CA | ||
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states NEWBRIDGE NETWORKS CORPORATION 600 Marsh Road, P.O. Box 13600 Kanata, Ontario K2K 266 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITCHELL, Charles 78 Summerwalk Place Nepean, Ontario K2G 5Y4 / CA | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | Feray, Valérie, et al Cabinet FERAY/LENNE 44/52, Rue de la Justice 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/45] | Harding, Richard Patrick, et al Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 97900904.0 | 27.01.1997 | [1998/45] | WO1997CA00052 | Priority number, date | GB19960001692 | 27.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601692 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727718 | Date: | 31.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0875123 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875123 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H04L12/43 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L12/43 (EP,US);
H04J2203/0039 (EP,US);
H04J2203/006 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5612 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5627 (EP,US);
Y10S370/907 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/45] | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGES ATM-NETZ | [1998/45] | English: | ATM NETWORK WITH RING ARCHITECTURE | [1998/45] | French: | RESEAU A MODE DE TRANSFERT ASYNCHRONE (ATM) A ARCHITECTURE EN ANNEAU | [1998/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 11.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - TSONG-HO WU ET AL, "A BROADBAND VIRTUAL PATH SONET/ATM SELF-HEALING RING ARCHITECTURE AND ITS ECONOMIC FEASIBILITY STUDY", COMMUNICATION FOR GLOBAL USERS, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI CONFERENCE ORLANDO, DEC. 6 - 9, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19921206), vol. 1 - 2 - 03, pages 834 - 840, XP000357681 [X] 1-3,5-9,12,14,15 *section 2* * page 837, column 1, line 7 - line 45 * * section 3.1 * | [X] - YOSHIO KAJIYAMA ET AL, "ATM SELF-HEALING RING", COMMUNICATION FOR GLOBAL USERS, INCLUDING A COMMUNICATIONS THEORY MINI CONFERENCE ORLANDO, DEC. 6 - 9, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19921206), vol. 1 - 2 - 03, pages 639 - 643, XP000357855 [X] 1,3-8,14-18 * page 639, column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * page 639, column 2, line 7 - page 640, column 2, line 3 * * page 640, column 2, line 29 - page 642, column 1, line 15 * | [X] - YOSHIO KAJIYAMA ET AL, "AN ATM VP-BASED SELF-HEALING RING", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, (19940101), vol. 12, no. 1, pages 171 - 177, XP000493898 [X] 1,8-11,13 * page 171, column 1, line 18 - column 2, line 16 * * page 172, column 2, line 25 - line 32 * * page 174, column 2, line 15 - page 175, column 2, line 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.265716 |