EP0877653 - AEROSOL INTENDED FOR DISPENSING A MULTI-COMPONENT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRSPRAY INTERNATIONAL B.V. Ivoorstraat 9 1812 RE Alkmaar / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states AIRSPRAY INTERNATIONAL B.V. 31-33 Zuiderkade NL-1948 NG Beverwijk / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER HEIJDEN, Edgar, Ivo, Maria Joh. Huizingastraat 14 NL-1827 NA Alkmaar / NL | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Brookhuis, Hendrik Jan Arnold Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1998/47] | Bakkum, Ruben Joseph, et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 97901272.1 | 31.01.1997 | [1998/47] | WO1997NL00028 | Priority number, date | NL19961002211 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: NL 1002211 | NL19961004121 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: NL 1004121 | NL19961004332 | 22.10.1996 Original published format: NL 1004332 | [1998/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9727947 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877653 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877653 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, B05B7/00, B65D83/14 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B05B7/0025 (EP,US);
B05B11/00 (KR);
B05B11/1087 (EP,US);
B05B11/028 (EP,US);
B05B11/1001 (EP,US);
B05B11/1078 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | SPRÜHVORRICHTUNG ZUR ABGABE VON MEHRKOMPONENTENMATERIAL | [1998/47] | English: | AEROSOL INTENDED FOR DISPENSING A MULTI-COMPONENT MATERIAL | [1998/47] | French: | Aérosol conçu pour la distribution d'un produit multi-composants | [2001/45] |
Former [1998/47] | AEROSOL CON U POUR LA DISTRIBUTION D'UN PRODUIT MULTI-COMPOSANT | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.1997 | Translation filed | 21.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.07.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.10.2002 | FI | 16.10.2002 | GR | 16.10.2002 | DK | 16.01.2003 | PT | 16.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | IE | 31.01.2003 | LU | 31.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | [2007/17] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
IE | 31.01.2003 | ||
LU | 31.01.2003 | ||
MC | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
IE | 31.01.2003 | ||
LU | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
IE | 31.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
FI | 16.10.2002 | ||
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 16.10.2002 | |
GR | 16.10.2002 | ||
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 16.10.2002 | |
PT | 16.01.2003 | ||
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 16.01.2003 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 16.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]CH545232 (WRIGHT HERSHEL EARL [US]) [X] 6 * column 11, line 8 - line 64; figure 7 *; | [A]EP0318834 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 29; figure . *; | [A]EP0486355 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 4 - line 19; figure 8 *; | [A]WO9304940 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0613728 (DAIWA CAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 6 * abstract *; | [A]US5439141 (CLARK GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 5 - line 33; figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP0676339 (MICYS COMPANY SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 17 - line 25; figure - *; | [A]WO9530490 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [A] 6* page 15, line 17 - page 16, line 27; figure 4 * |