EP0888295 - SYNTHESIS OF ANIONIC CLEANING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZMAN, Steven, Wayne 1 Three Mile Court, Gosforth Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE3 2JP / GB | 02 /
SHUMATE, Robert, Edward 1093 Davis Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | Peet, Jillian Wendy, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97901911.4 | 06.01.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997US00082 | Priority number, date | GB19960001880 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: GB 9601880 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9728119 | Date: | 07.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0888295 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C303/24, C07C29/147, C11D1/16, C11D1/29 | [2000/49] | CPC: |
C11D1/29 (EP);
C07C29/147 (EP);
C07C303/24 (EP);
C11D1/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/147, C07C31/20 (EP);
C07C303/24, C07C305/10 (EP) |
Former IPC [1999/01] | C07C305/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1999/01] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON ANIONISCHEN REINIGUNGSMITTELN | [1999/01] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF ANIONIC CLEANING AGENTS | [1999/01] | French: | SYNTHESE D'AGENTS DE NETTOYAGE ANIONIQUES | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1998 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1998 | Search fee paid | 05.08.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.08.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 01.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/08] | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0373946 (TONEN CORP) [Y] 1-20 * column 3, lines 10-42 * * claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0143634 (DAVY MCKEE LONDON) [Y] 1-20 * page 9, lines 1-25 * | International search | [A]US3634269 ; | [A]US4000081 |