EP0886564 - SHAVING SYSTEMS WITH FOAM SKIN-ENGAGING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COFFIN, David, C. 909 West River Street Milford, CT 06460 / US | 02 /
THONE, Jochen Erbschloerstrasse 67 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Powell, Timothy John Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Powell, Timothy John Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97901944.5 | 02.01.1997 | [1999/01] | WO1997US00253 | Priority number, date | US19960615910P | 14.03.1996 Original published format: US 615910 P | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9733728 | Date: | 18.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886564 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886564 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/40 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
B26B21/443 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1999/01] | Title | German: | RASIERSYSTEME MIT HAUTKONTAKTGLIED AUS SCHAUM | [1999/01] | English: | SHAVING SYSTEMS WITH FOAM SKIN-ENGAGING ELEMENT | [1999/01] | French: | SYSTEMES DE RASAGE A ELEMENT DE CONTACT AVEC LA PEAU EN MATIERE ALVEOLAIRE | [1999/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 26.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0276066 (THE GILLETTE COMPANY) [X] 1,2,5-8,24,25,28 * column 3, line 6 - line 21; figure 9 * [Y] 14,19,29,30,33,35,36; | [XY]US4872263 (ETHEREDGE) [X] 1 * column W * [Y] 14,19,29,30,33,35,36; | [X]US3969817 (DIBUONO) [X] 1,2 * column W *; | [X]US4314404 (RUIZ) [X] 1,2 * column W * |