EP0879412 - ENZYME DETECTION BIOSENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambri Limited 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states AUSTRALIAN MEMBRANE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | ||
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states AUSTRALIAN MEMBRANE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAACH-MAKSVYTIS, Vijoleta, Lucija, Bronislava 9 Darley Street Dulwich Hills, NSW 2203 / AU | 02 /
CORNELL, Bruce, Andrew 58 Wycombe Road Neutral Bay, NSW 2089 / AU | 03 /
THOMSON, David, Geoffrey 19 Koninderie Parade Narara, NSW 2250 / AU | 04 /
RAGUSE, Burkhard 2 Mudies Road St. Ives, NSW 2075 / AU | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97902105.2 | 10.02.1997 | [1998/48] | WO1997AU00071 | Priority number, date | US19960011314P | 08.02.1996 Original published format: US 11314 P | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729366 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0879412 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, G01N27/333, G01N33/50, G01N33/574, G01N33/68, G01N33/96 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP,US);
C12Q1/002 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
Y10S435/817 (EP,US);
Y10S436/806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/48] | Title | German: | BIOSENSOR UM ENZYME AUFZUFINDEN | [1998/48] | English: | ENZYME DETECTION BIOSENSORS | [1998/48] | French: | BIOCAPTEURS DE DETECTION DES ENZYMES | [1998/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1998 | Search fee paid | 01.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 01.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/48] | 29.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/08] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.1999 | 28.02.2006 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Biosensor Entreprises, LLC 925 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Date: | 25.08.2003 | [2003/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9615454 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al) [PX] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]WO9424562 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *; | [A]WO9412875 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * abstract *; | [A]WO9407593 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al) [A] 1,6,9 * abstract * | International search | [AP]WO9612957 (PITTNER FRITZ [AT], et al); | [XP]AU3864395 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al); | [AP]AU5640396 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al); | [X]WO9516206 (BIOSYSTEMS TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]); | [A]WO9508637 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]); | [A]US5368712 (TOMICH JOHN [US], et al); | [A]AU6532794 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al); | [A]AU5618894 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al); | [A]AU5144493 (AMBRI LTD); | [A]EP0342382 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]GB2195450 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) |