EP0821309 - INFORMATION PROCESSOR, FILE NAME CHANGING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM ON WHICH FILE NAME CHANGING PROGRAM IS STORED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOKUCHI, Tatsuya Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
UDAGAWA, Osamu Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
KANEKO, Yasuyoshi Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
TAIRA, Kazuhisa Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [1998/05] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97902622.6 | 07.02.1997 | [1998/05] | WO1997JP00321 | Priority number, date | JP19960048211 | 09.02.1996 Original published format: JP 4821196 | [1998/05] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729426 | Date: | 14.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0821309 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.08.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/00, G06F17/30 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G06F16/166 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
|
Former IPC [1998/05] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/05] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSPROZESSOR, VERÄNDERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DATEINAMEN UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM AUF DEM EIN PROGRAMM ZUR VERÄNDERUNG VON DATEINAMEN GESPEICHERT IST | [1998/05] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSOR, FILE NAME CHANGING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM ON WHICH FILE NAME CHANGING PROGRAM IS STORED | [1998/05] | French: | PROCESSEUR D'INFORMATIONS, PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DE NOMS DE FICHIERS, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT SUR LEQUEL UN PROGRAMME DE CHANGEMENT DE NOM DE FICHIER EST ENREGISTRE | [1998/05] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1997 | Translation filed | 09.10.1997 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1997 | Search fee paid | 09.10.1997 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.1997 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 29.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9308530 (WNM VENTURES INC [US]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [X]EP0578205 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0588488 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - column 3, line 14 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 22 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 17 *; | [A]US5307494 (YASUMATSU KAZUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 17; figures 1-6 * * column 4, line 58 - column 6, line 14 *; | [X]EP0618540 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 34 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 22 * * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 11 * * column 10, line 52 - column 12, line 35 * | International search | [Y]JPH06161855 (AT & T CORP [US]); | [Y]JPH06187211 (MICROSOFT CORP); | [Y]JPH06231023 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JPH06309207 (MICROSOFT CORP); | [Y]JPH07503084 |