EP0850027 - ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2003 [2003/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun GmbH 61476 Kronberg / DE | [1999/48] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILFINGER, Peter Gartenfeldstrasse 83 D-61350 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
SCHWARZ-HARTMANN, Armin Brunnengasse 2 D-55234 Albig / DE | 03 /
HERZOG, Karl Marquardstrasse 29 D-60489 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1998/27] | Application number, filing date | 97903255.4 | 11.02.1997 | [1998/27] | WO1997EP00617 | Priority number, date | DE1996127752 | 10.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627752 | [1998/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9801083 | Date: | 15.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850027 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850027 | Date: | 22.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/26, A61C17/34 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
A61C17/3472 (EP,US);
A46B13/02 (KR);
A61C17/26 (KR);
A61C17/34 (KR);
A61C17/3427 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ZAHNBÜRSTE | [1998/27] | English: | ELECTRIC TOOTHBRUSH | [1998/27] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS ELECTRIQUE | [1998/27] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1998 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3978852 (ANNONI JERRY D) [A] 1 * figures 5,6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0327876 (GIMELLI & CO AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9310721 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 22 - line 28; figures 1,3; claim 3 *; | [A]WO9423667 (MAURER ANDREAS [CH]) [A] 1* page 3, line 2 - line 19; claims 1,2,15 * |