EP0898849 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECTIONAL RADIO COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states Nokia Networks Oy Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATZ, Marcos Aleksanterinkatu 15 A 7 FIN-90100 Oulu / FI | 02 /
KIISKI, Matti Mustalinnuntie 21 FIN-90460 Oulunsalo / FI | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97903270.3 | 13.02.1997 | [1999/09] | WO1997EP00667 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9836598 | Date: | 20.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0898849 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG FÜR RICHTFUNKKOMMUNIKATION | [1999/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DIRECTIONAL RADIO COMMUNICATION | [1999/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR COMMUNICATION RADIO DIRECTIONNELLE | [1999/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 10.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/10] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0729285 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 20 - column 7, line 26 * * claims 1-3 * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0647978 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-14 * column 8, lines 2-53 * * column 10, line 35 - column 12, line 30 * * column 13, line 38 - column 15, line 26 * |