EP0884997 - COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AN ANTIFUNGAL AND A SULFUR COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | For all designated states NEUTROGENA CORPORATION 5760 West 96th Street Los Angeles California 90045-5544 / US | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutsebaan 30 2340 Beerse / BE | ||
For all designated states NEUTROGENA CORPORATION 5760 West 96th Street Los Angeles California 90045-5544 / US | |||
For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODDS, Frank, Christopher Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
DE DONCKER, Piet, R., G. Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
HO, Kie Neutrogena Corporation, 5800 Arbor Vitae Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 04 /
FERNANDEZ, Candelario, A. Neutrogena Corporation,5 5800 Arbor Vitae Los Angeles, CA 90045 / US | 05 /
CAUWENBERGH. Gerard Frans Maria Jan c/o Johnson & Johnson Consumers Comp., Inc. Grandview Rd. Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Johnson & Johnson Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/52] | Quaghebeur, Luc, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V., Patent Department, Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 97903290.1 | 13.02.1997 | [1998/52] | WO1997EP00714 | Priority number, date | EP19960200409 | 16.02.1996 Original published format: EP 96200409 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9729733 | Date: | 21.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884997 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0884997 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | [1998/52] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/52] | Extension states | LT | 16.09.1998 | LV | 16.09.1998 | RO | 16.09.1998 | SI | 16.09.1998 | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE UND SCHWEFEL ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1998/52] | English: | COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AN ANTIFUNGAL AND A SULFUR COMPOUND | [1998/52] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT UN ANTIFONGIQUE ET UN COMPOSE SOUFRE | [1998/52] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1998 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2058563 (NELSON RES & DEV) [X] 1-4 * claims 1,4,5,8 * * page 2, lines 93-119 *; | [X]US4835148 (BARFORD BRIAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13 * claims 1,2,4,5 * * column 3, line 52 - column 7, line 6 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 44 *; | [X]ES2024349 (URIACH & CIA SA J [ES]) [X] 1-3; | [X]ES2061407 (CASTILLA CID CARLOS ARTURO [ES]) [X] 1-6; | [X]EP0680745 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-9,11,13 * claims 1-5,11-15 * * page 2, lines 48-55 * * page 3, lines 18-37 * * example 1 *; | [DPX]WO9629045 (UNIV RAMOT [IL], et al) [DPX] 1-6 * claims 1-9 * * page 2, lines 9-14 * * page 3, lines 7-17 *; | [DPX]WO9629983 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [DPX] 1-8,11-13 * claims 1-13,21,32 * * page 8, lines 20-26 * * page 10, line 34 - page 11, line 8 ** page 11, line 35 - page 12, line 13 *; | [X] - J.BARTROLI E.A., "Process for preparation of new pyridine oxide-containing triazole derivatives as fungicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920831), vol. 117, no. 9, Database accession no. 90300, XP002033182 [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - C.CASTILLA,A.CARLOS, "Fast-acting antifungal and antibacterial shampoo", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950515), vol. 122, no. 20, Database accession no. 248020, XP002033183 [X] 1-6 * abstract * |