EP0881954 - MULTI-COAT PAINTING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [1998/50] | For all designated states Herberts Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLAAK, Detlef Gärtnerstrasse 43 D-42369 Wuppertal / DE | [1998/50] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/50] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97903326.3 | 19.02.1997 | [1998/50] | WO1997EP00784 | Priority number, date | DE19961006716 | 23.02.1996 Original published format: DE 19606716 | [1998/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9730795 | Date: | 28.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881954 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881954 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B05D7/00 | [1998/50] | CPC: |
B05D7/577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1998/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MEHRSCHICHTLACKIERUNG | [1998/50] | English: | MULTI-COAT PAINTING PROCESS | [1998/50] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'APPLICATION DE PEINTURE EN PLUSIEURS COUCHES | [1998/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.1998 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/50] | 26.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 22.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 04.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG CT/R-B311 Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Hauser Ring 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | 02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich Bungartz & Kreutzer Patentanwälte August-Hirsch-Strasse 10 47119 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich Bungartz & Kreutzer Patentanwälte August-Hirsch-Strasse 10 47119 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2005/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei August-Hirsch-Strasse 10 47119 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2004/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Kreutzer, Ulrich (DE) Patentanwälte Bungartz & Kreutzer August-Hirsch-Strasse 10 D-47119 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Brandenburg, Thomas Patentanwälte Brandenburg, Dunkelberg & Franke Frankfurter Strasse 68 53773 Hennef / DE | |||
Former [2000/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2000
19.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE BASF Coatings AG Glasuritstr. 1 48165 Münster / DE Opponent's representative Münch, Volker, Dr. Dres. Fitzner & Münch Rechts- und Patentanwälte Lintorfer Strasse 10 40878 Ratingen / DE | ||
02
11.05.2000
23.05.2000
ADMISSIBLE Bollig & Kemper GmbH & Co. KG Vitalisstrasse 114 50872 Köln / DE Opponent's representative Stute, Ivo, Dipl.-Ing. Partnerschaft Dunkelberg & Stute Patentanwälte Friesenwall 5-7 50672 Köln / DE | 15.06.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.12.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.05.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.07.2002 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.11.2004 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2005/05] | Appeal following opposition | 12.09.2002 | Appeal received No. T0909/02 | 11.11.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.11.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 24.08.2002 | Appeal received | 23.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2004 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0548845 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE19541461 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1 * the whole document * |